EP0051376 - Solenoid-operated valve means for hydraulic systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1986 [1986/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harrison, Anthony William 63 Middle Park Road Selly Oak Birmingham B29 4BH / GB | [1982/19] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304829.5 | 16.10.1981 | [1982/19] | Priority number, date | GB19800035193 | 01.11.1980 Original published format: GB 8035193 | [1982/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0051376 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0051376 | Date: | 10.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051376 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/04, F15B13/02, F16K17/00 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
B60G17/056 (EP,US);
B60G17/0152 (EP,US);
B60G2500/30 (EP,US);
B60G2600/26 (EP,US);
Y10T137/262 (EP,US);
Y10T137/264 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1982/19] | B60G17/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1982/19] | Title | German: | Durch ein Solenoid betätigtes Ventil für hydraulische Systeme | [1982/19] | English: | Solenoid-operated valve means for hydraulic systems | [1982/19] | French: | Dispositif de valve à actionnement par solénoide pour systèmes hydrauliques | [1982/19] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/18] | 14.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1150521 (MIDLAND ROSS CORP [US]); | [A]GB1156018 (TEDDINGTON AIRCRAFT CONTROLS L); | [A]GB1323985 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]US3799570 (GIORDANO J, et al); | [A]US4114648 (NAKAJIMA HIROYUKI, et al); | [A]EP0017351 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) | Examination | FR882330 | GB1159648 |