EP0053875 - High temperature insulation panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELTECH SYSTEMS CORPORATION Corporate Headquarters 6100 Glades Road/Suite 305 Boca Raton Florida 33434 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | For all designated states ELTECH SYSTEMS CORPORATION Corporate Headquarters 6100 Glades Road/Suite 305 Boca Raton Florida 33434 / US | ||
Former [1982/24] | For all designated states Miller, Thomas Michael 26027 Byron Drive North Olmsted Ohio 44070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Thomas Michael 26027 Byron Drive North Olmsted, Ohio44070 / US | [1986/51] |
Former [1984/29] | 01 /
Miller, Thomas Michael 26027 Byron Drive | ||
Former [1982/24] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Avenue de Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [1984/29] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al c/o DST SA 9, Route de Troinex CH-1227 Carouge/GE / CH | ||
Former [1984/28] | Kügele, Bernhard c/o DST SA 9, Route de Troinex CH-1227 Carouge/GE / CH | ||
Former [1982/34] | Shaw, Laurence 5th Floor, Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | ||
Former [1982/24] | Shaw, Laurence 23 Greening Drive Edgbaston, Birmingham B15 2XA / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305119.0 | 29.10.1981 | [1982/24] | Priority number, date | US19800213557 | 05.12.1980 Original published format: US 213557 | [1982/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053875 | Date: | 16.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053875 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/00 | [1982/24] | CPC: |
F27D1/144 (EP);
F27D1/0016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/24] | Title | German: | Wärmeisolierende Auskleidungsplatte für hohe Temperaturen | [1982/24] | English: | High temperature insulation panels | [1982/24] | French: | Panneaux d'isolation thermique pour des températures élevées | [1982/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/09] | 16.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1984 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3990203 [ ] (GREAVES JAMES R); | FR2388197 [ ] (BERTIN & CIE [FR]); | GB2004626 [ ] (STUDWELDPRO UK LTD); | GB1555459 [ ] (CLINOTHER MLTD); | EP0010444 [ ] (DUCTILE HOT MILL LTD [GB]) |