EP0057785 - Process for the preparation of a flavored alcoholic beverage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/33] | Process for the preparation of a stable flavored malt beverage | ||
[1985/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.1986 [1986/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miller Brewing Company 3939 W. Highland Boulevard Milwaukee Wisconsin 53223 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/33] | For all designated states Miller Brewing Company 3939 W. Highland Boulevard Milwaukee Wisconsin 53223 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldstein, Henry 15645 Heather Hill Drive Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | 02 /
Hoff, Joseph T. West 305 North 5295 Gail Lane Hartland Wisconsin 53029 / US | 03 /
Cronan, Charles L. 4239 North Larkin Street Shorewood Wisconsin 53211 / US | 04 /
Rao, Ch. Subba 7731 North 59th Street Milwaukee Wisconsin 53223 / US | [1982/33] | Representative(s) | Wynne-Jones, John Vaughan, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James, Essex Place, 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/33] | Wynne-Jones, John Vaughan, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305121.6 | 29.10.1981 | [1982/33] | Priority number, date | US19810231971 | 06.02.1981 Original published format: US 231971 | [1982/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0057785 | Date: | 18.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0057785 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057785 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C12G3/08 | [1982/33] | CPC: |
C12H3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines aromatisierten alkoholischen Getränks | [1985/35] | English: | Process for the preparation of a flavored alcoholic beverage | [1985/35] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une boisson aromatisée et alcoholique | [1985/35] |
Former [1982/33] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines aromatisierten stabilen Malzgetränks | ||
Former [1982/33] | Process for the preparation of a stable flavored malt beverage | ||
Former [1982/33] | Procédé pour la préparation d'une boisson stable aromatisée à base de malt | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/44] | 05.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1177126 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 83, no. 13, 22nd December 1975, page 279, no. 204769f, Columbus Ohio (USA); | [A] - MICROBIOLOGY ABSTRACTS SECT A., vol. 14, no. 11, November 1979, page 45, no. 8546-A14, London (GB); |