EP0051961 - Apparatus for monitoring a valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.1983 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROSBY VALVE & GAGE COMPANY 43 Kendrick Street Wrentham Massachusetts 02093 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | For all designated states CROSBY VALVE & GAGE COMPANY 43 Kendrick Street Wrentham Massachusetts 02093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thompson, Leonard J. 175 Walnut Road Wrentham Massachusetts 02093 / US | 02 /
Gonyaw, Stephen C. 504 Ware Street Mansfield Massachusetts 02048 / US | 03 /
Zahorsky, John Richard 8 Greenwich Road Norwood Massachusetts 02062 / US | [1982/20] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Brian Patrick, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | Hughes, Brian Patrick, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305126.5 | 29.10.1981 | [1982/20] | Priority number, date | US19800205338 | 10.11.1980 Original published format: US 205338 | [1982/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051961 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16K37/00, H01H36/00 | [1982/20] | CPC: |
F16K37/0033 (EP);
F16K37/00 (KR);
F16K37/0041 (EP);
H01H36/00 (KR);
H01H36/0046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/20] | Title | German: | Ventilüberwachungsanlage | [1982/20] | English: | Apparatus for monitoring a valve | [1982/20] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance d'une vanne | [1982/20] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 11.02.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/29] | 22.04.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1186300 [ ] (SEULEN GERHARD WALTER [DE]); | FR2446973 [ ] (AEROQUIP AG [CH]); | US4093000 [ ] (POFF JAMES S); | US3719203 [ ] (WETTRE G); | US3896280 [ ] (BLAKE DOUGLAS O); | GB1103118 [ ] (WALTER DOUGLASS, et al); | GB1177932 [ ] (WADE PNEUMATIC LTD) | [ ] - HYDRAULIC PNEUMATIC POWER, vol. 13, no. 148, April 1967, J.R. FAWCETT "Pneumatic and the Reed Switch"pages 187 to 190 |