EP0053879 - Filter elements and processes for the production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1987 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1987 [1987/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha No 8, Dojimahamadouri 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/24] | For all designated states Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha No 8, Dojimahamadouri 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tani, Yatsuhiro No. 21, Mibunaginomiya-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Ohmori, Susumu No. 168-7, Sakamotohommachi Otsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 03 /
Komagata, Hideki No. 1300-1, Honkatata-cho Otsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | [1982/24] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1982/24] | Dunlop, John Henderson GILL JENNINGS & EVERY 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HN / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305357.6 | 11.11.1981 | [1982/24] | Priority number, date | JP19800159959 | 12.11.1980 Original published format: JP 15995980 | [1982/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0053879 | Date: | 16.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0053879 | Date: | 10.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053879 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/14 | [1982/24] | CPC: |
D04H1/72 (EP,US);
B01D46/10 (EP,US);
D04H1/435 (EP,US);
D04H1/60 (EP,US);
F02M35/024 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0233 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0471 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0618 (EP,US);
B01D2239/064 (EP,US);
B01D2239/065 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0695 (EP,US);
B01D2239/086 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1233 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1241 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1291 (EP,US);
Y10S55/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/24] | Title | German: | Filterelemente und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1982/24] | English: | Filter elements and processes for the production thereof | [1982/24] | French: | Eléments filtrants et procédés pour leur fabrication | [1982/24] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/16] | 15.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.09.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3073735 (TILL DEREK E, et al); | [Y]GB2015604 (KROYER K K K); | [A]BE542362 | [X] - SCHWEIZERISCHE TECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, vol. 66, no. 33, 14th August 1969, pages 665-680, Wabern, CH. |