EP0052990 - Aeroseol can closure cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/22] | Container cap | ||
[1985/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pehr, Harold T. P.O. Box 6698 Leawood, KS 66206 / US | For all designated states Pehr, Janice B. 3920 West 96th Street Overland Park Kansas 66207 / US | For all designated states Fritzshall, Richard B. 47 East 106th Street Kansas City Missouri / US | For all designated states Fritzshall, Dorothy 47 East 106th Street Kansas City Missouri / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/22] | For all designated states Pehr, Harold T. P.O. Box 6698 Leawood, KS 66206 / US | ||
For all designated states Pehr, Janice B. 3920 West 96th Street Overland Park Kansas 66207 / US | |||
For all designated states Fritzshall, Richard B. 47 East 106th Street Kansas City Missouri / US | |||
For all designated states Fritzshall, Dorothy 47 East 106th Street Kansas City Missouri / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pehr, Harold T. 253 Merihil Office Center 6900 West 80th Street Overland Park Kansas 66204 / US | [1982/22] | Representative(s) | Williams, Trevor John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | [1982/22] | Application number, filing date | 81305408.7 | 16.11.1981 | [1982/22] | Priority number, date | US19800209671 | 24.11.1980 Original published format: US 209671 | [1982/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052990 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052990 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/14 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
B65D83/40 (EP,US);
B05B11/0032 (EP,US);
B65D83/226 (EP,US);
B65D83/228 (EP,US);
B65D83/757 (EP,US);
Y10S220/915 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/22] | Title | German: | Verschlusskappe von Aerosolbehältern | [1985/20] | English: | Aeroseol can closure cap | [1985/20] | French: | Capuchon pour récipient d'aérosol | [1985/20] |
Former [1982/22] | Verschlusskappe | ||
Former [1982/22] | Container cap | ||
Former [1982/22] | Capuchon pour récipient | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 31.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/19] | Request for further processing for: | 04.05.1984 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.1984 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.05.1984 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.05.1985 | BE | 15.05.1985 | CH | 15.05.1985 | IT | 15.05.1985 | LI | 15.05.1985 | NL | 15.05.1985 | SE | 30.05.1985 | LU | 30.11.1985 | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.05.1985 | |
BE | 15.05.1985 | ||
CH | 15.05.1985 | ||
IT | 15.05.1985 | ||
LI | 15.05.1985 | ||
NL | 15.05.1985 | ||
SE | 30.05.1985 | ||
Former [1989/18] | AT | 15.05.1985 | |
BE | 15.05.1985 | ||
CH | 15.05.1985 | ||
LI | 15.05.1985 | ||
NL | 15.05.1985 | ||
SE | 30.05.1985 | ||
Former [1988/13] | AT | 15.05.1985 | |
BE | 15.05.1985 | ||
NL | 15.05.1985 | ||
SE | 30.05.1985 | ||
Former [1988/04] | AT | 15.05.1985 | |
BE | 15.05.1985 | ||
NL | 15.05.1985 | ||
Former [1986/45] | AT | 15.05.1985 | |
NL | 15.05.1985 | ||
Former [1986/30] | NL | 15.05.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1293629 ; | [A]FR2294932 (REFIL AG [LI]); | [A]US4135638 (WANDL RUDOLF H) | Examination | FR2294932 |