EP0054413 - Combined television camera and recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/25] | Signal recording apparatus and combined television camera and recording apparatus | ||
[1985/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA CORPORATION 30 Rockefeller Plaza New York, NY 10020 / US | [1982/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dischert, Robert Adams 16 Bloomer Drive Burlington New Jersey 08106 / US | [1982/25] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [1983/01] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al c/o RCA International Limited Norfolk House 31 St. James's Square London, SW1Y 4JR / GB | ||
Former [1982/25] | Pratt, Richard Wilson c/o RCA International Limited Norfolk House 31 St. James's Square London SW1Y 4JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305826.0 | 10.12.1981 | [1982/25] | Priority number, date | US19800216170 | 15.12.1980 Original published format: US 216170 | [1982/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054413 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0054413 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76, H04N5/91, G11B27/10 | [1982/25] | CPC: |
H04N9/79 (EP);
H04N5/772 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1982/25] | Title | German: | Mit dem Signalaufzeichnungsgerät kombinierte Fernsehkamera | [1985/23] | English: | Combined television camera and recording apparatus | [1985/23] | French: | Caméra de télévision combinée avec ledit appareil d'enregistrement | [1985/23] |
Former [1982/25] | Signalaufzeichnungsgerät und mit dem Signalaufzeichnungsgerät kombinierte Fernsehkamera | ||
Former [1982/25] | Signal recording apparatus and combined television camera and recording apparatus | ||
Former [1982/25] | Appareil d'enregistrement de signaux et caméra de télévision combinée avec ledit appareil d'enregistrement | Examination procedure | 29.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 19.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3197559 (NOBUTOSHI KIHARA); | [A]US3470317 (KIHARA NOBUTOSHI); | [AD]US3962725 (LEMKE JAMES U, et al); | [Y]FR2339307 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]DE2701630 (BASF AG) | Examination | US4277729 |