Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
18.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1986 [1986/23] |
05.04.1985 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.1985 [1985/23] |
09.12.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.02.1983 [1983/06] |
03.11.1982 | Change - representative | published on 05.01.1983 [1983/01] |
23.04.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.06.1982 [1982/25] |