EP0055055 - Method of stabilizing hydrophilic polymer compositions and stabilized hydrophilic polymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1984 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Witiak, David 500 Stony Hill Road Yardley Pennsylvania 19067 / US | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305838.5 | 11.12.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | US19800218909 | 22.12.1980 Original published format: US 218909 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0055055 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0055055 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/44 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
C08F8/44 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/44, C08F220/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Stabilisierung von hydrophilen Polymerzusammensetzungen und stabilisierte hydrophile Polymerzusammensetzungen | [1982/26] | English: | Method of stabilizing hydrophilic polymer compositions and stabilized hydrophilic polymer compositions | [1982/26] | French: | Procédé pour stabiliser des compositions de polymères hydrophiles et compositions de polymères hydrophiles stabiliseés | [1982/26] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/01] | 31.10.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/19] | 11.01.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2276340 (DU PONT [US]); | [AD]US4104214 (MEIERHOEFER ALAN W) |