EP0055056 - Alloy rayon fibers of high fluid-holding capacity, method of producing them and manufactured articles comprising them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.12.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Frederick Ray Route 1 Box 103-G Toms Brook Virginia 22660 / US | 02 /
Witiak, David 500 Stony Hill Road Yardley Pennsylvania 19067 / US | 03 /
Toy, Walter Weiyoung 849 Concord Place Lansdale Pennsylvania 19446 / US | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305839.3 | 11.12.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | US19800219134 | 22.12.1980 Original published format: US 219134 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0055056 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | D01F2/08, A61L15/00, C08L1/24 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
D01F2/08 (EP);
A61L15/225 (EP);
C08L1/24 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/225, C08L1/24 (EP);
A61L15/225, C08L1/24, C08L33/14, C08L33/04, C08L33/02 (EP);
C08L1/24, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/26] | Title | German: | Fasern mit hoher Absorptionsfähigkeit für Flüssigkeiten, bestehend aus einer Mischung von Rayon und Polymeren, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese Fasern enthaltende Gebilde | [1982/26] | English: | Alloy rayon fibers of high fluid-holding capacity, method of producing them and manufactured articles comprising them | [1982/26] | French: | Fibres de rayonne alliée, à haute capacité de rétention de liquides, procédé pour leur fabrication et articles contenant ces fibres | [1982/26] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/01] | 24.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/07] | 20.04.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4066584 [ ] (ALLEN THOMAS C, et al); | US4104214 [ ] (MEIERHOEFER ALAN W) |