EP0055568 - Read-write head thermal compensation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rodime PLC 59/60 Nasmyth Road, Southfield Industrial Estate Glenrothes, Fife KY7 5QR Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/27] | For all designated states Rodime PLC 59/60 Nasmyth Road, Southfield Industrial Estate Glenrothes, Fife KY7 5QR Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, James Normal Jackson 11 Lomond Place Kinross KY13 7BH Scotland / GB | 02 /
Caithness, Michael Gordon 13 Crammond Place Dalgetty Bay, Fife KY11 5LF Scotland / GB | [1982/27] | Representative(s) | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1982/27] | Wotherspoon, Graham FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305976.3 | 21.12.1981 | [1982/27] | Priority number, date | GB19800041323 | 23.12.1980 Original published format: GB 8041323 | [1982/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0055568 | Date: | 07.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/58, G11B21/10, // G11B5/55 | [1982/27] | CPC: |
G11B5/5565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/27] | Title | German: | Temperaturausgleichssystem für einen Lese-/Schreibkopf | [1982/27] | English: | Read-write head thermal compensation system | [1982/27] | French: | Système de compensation thermique pour une tête de lecture et d'écriture | [1982/27] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 07.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/25] | 07.04.1983 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 10.07.1984 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request rejected | 13.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/35] | Appeal following examination | 21.08.1984 | Appeal received No. J0023/84 | 13.11.1984 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.01.1983 | M02   Fee paid on   07.04.1983 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.1984 | 31.12.1985 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.01.1983 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal incapacity of representative | 07.04.1983 | Resumption of proceedings | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3723980 ; | [A]GB792729 ; | [A]US4185310 ; | [P]JPS5611663 ; | [A]JPS51146207 ; | [A]JPS5211912 ; | [A]JPS5230406 ; | [A]JPS54113312 | [P] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 60, April 23, 1981page 35 P 58 & JP - A - 56011663 (NIPPON DENKI) (05-02-1981) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 50, May 16, 1977page 3251 E 76 & JP - A - 51 146207 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) (15-12-1976) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 76, July 21, 1977page 1036 E 77 & JP - A - 52011912 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) (29-01-1977) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 95, August 29, 1977page 2809 E 77 & JP - A - 52030406 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) ( 08-03-1977) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 135, November 10, 1979page 124 E 150 & JP - A - 54 113312 (FUJITSU) (04-09-1979) | [A] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, vol. 5, no. 5, September/October 1980, Stamford/ConnecticutUS ANDERSON et al.: "Thermal Servo System for Mechanical Positioning" page 549 |