EP0055929 - Antibiotic C-19393 E5 and production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1986 [1986/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1983/43] |
Former [1982/28] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 3-6, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Setsuo 3-31, Seiwadainishi 2-chome Kawanishi Hyogo 666-01 / JP | 02 /
Shinagawa, Susumu 3-31, Higashiishikiricho 6-chome Higashiosaka Osaka 579 / JP | 03 /
Kitano, Kazuaki 15-4, Akasakadai 4-cho Sakai Osaka 590-01 / JP | [1982/28] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/28] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 81306142.1 | 24.12.1981 | [1982/28] | Priority number, date | JP19800185450 | 26.12.1980 Original published format: JP 18545080 | [1982/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0055929 | Date: | 14.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0055929 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/00, C12P17/10, C12P1/06, C12N1/20, A61K31/40 | [1982/28] | CPC: |
C07D477/20 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12P17/184 (EP,US);
C12R2001/545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/28] | Title | German: | Antibiotikum C-19393 E5 und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1982/28] | English: | Antibiotic C-19393 E5 and production thereof | [1982/28] | French: | Antibiotique C-19393 E5 et procédé pour sa production | [1982/28] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 02.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/03] | 30.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3003624 [ ] (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) |