EP0033676 - Common antenna for primary radar and secondary radar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1981/32] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupressoir, Albert THOMSON-CSF - SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1981/32] | Representative(s) | Benoit, Monique, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | Benoit, Monique, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1981/32] | Eisenbeth, Jacques Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400052.7 | 16.01.1981 | [1981/32] | Priority number, date | FR19800001760 | 28.01.1980 Original published format: FR 8001760 | [1981/42] |
Former [1981/32] | deleted | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0033676 | Date: | 12.08.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0033676 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/28, H01Q25/00, H01Q9/27 | [1981/32] | CPC: |
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q21/067 (EP,US);
H01Q25/00 (EP,US);
H01Q9/27 (EP,US);
Y10S430/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/32] | Title | German: | Gemeinsame Antenne für Primär-Radar und Sekundär-Radar | [1981/32] | English: | Common antenna for primary radar and secondary radar | [1981/32] | French: | Antenne commune pour radar primaire et radar secondaire | [1981/32] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/42] | 13.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | FR1094892 [ ] (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE); | FR1540954 [ ] (CSF); | US3445850 [ ] (STEGEN ROBERT J); | [X]US3550135 (BODMER MAXIMILIAAN HUBERT); | [D]EP0013240 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | Examination | - Antenna Engineering Handbook-Henry Jasik, Editor, MacGraw Hill, 1961 Ch. 17 p. 17-2, 17-3, 17-17,17-18, 17-20, 17-21 |