EP0034514 - Time division switching installation for lines carrying voice and data packets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dauphin, Jean-Louis 70, Résidence Corlay F-22300 Lannion / FR | For all designated states Louvet, Olivier 22, Avenue de Normandie, Keruhel F-22300 Lannion / FR | For all designated states Pitie, Jean-Marc 6, Résidence Corlay 22300 Lannion / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/34] | For all designated states Dauphin, Jean-Louis 70, Résidence Corlay F-22300 Lannion / FR | ||
For all designated states Louvet, Olivier 22, Avenue de Normandie, Keruhel F-22300 Lannion / FR | |||
For all designated states Pitie, Jean-Marc 6, Résidence Corlay F-22300 Lannion / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/34] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Martinet 62, rue des Mathurins F-75008 Paris / FR | [1981/34] | Application number, filing date | 81400127.7 | 28.01.1981 | [1981/34] | Priority number, date | FR19800003181 | 13.02.1980 Original published format: FR 8003181 | [1981/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0034514 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034514 | Date: | 09.03.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04M11/06 | [1981/34] | CPC: |
H04L12/64 (EP,US);
H04M11/068 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0428 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1981/34] | Title | German: | Digitale Zeitvielfach-Vermittlungsanlage für Leitungen mit Sprach- und Datenpaketübertragungen | [1981/34] | English: | Time division switching installation for lines carrying voice and data packets | [1981/34] | French: | Installation de commutation numérique à division du temps pour des lignes véhiculant la parole et des paquets de données | [1981/34] | File destroyed: | 05.09.1996 | Examination procedure | 15.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/47] | 13.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.09.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2412994 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, vol. COM-27, no. 7, juillet 1979 New York US TORU TSUDA et al.: "An Approach to Multi-Service Subscriber Loop System Using Packetized Voice/Data Terminals", pages 1112-1117 | [A] - CONFERENCE RECORD. 1978 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS vol. 2, 4-7 juin 1978 New York US RUDIN: "Studies of the integration of circuit and packet switching" pages 20.2.1 - 20.2.7 |