EP0034103 - Nuclear reactor control-rod operating devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1985 [1985/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/33] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desfontaines, Guy 18 rue Jean Jaurès F-92800 Puteaux / FR | [1981/33] | Representative(s) | Bouget, Lucien, et al CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier 75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/33] | Bouget, Lucien, et al CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier F-75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400218.4 | 12.02.1981 | [1981/33] | Priority number, date | FR19800003087 | 12.02.1980 Original published format: FR 8003087 | [1981/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0034103 | Date: | 19.08.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0034103 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034103 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G21C7/12, G21C19/10 | [1981/33] | CPC: |
G21C19/105 (EP,US);
G21C7/12 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18672 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [1981/33] | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtungen für die Regelstäbe eines Kernreaktors | [1981/33] | English: | Nuclear reactor control-rod operating devices | [1981/33] | French: | Perfectionnement aux dispositifs de commande des barres de réglage d'un réacteur nucléaire | [1981/33] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/47] | 15.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1241783 (CREUSOT FORGES ATELIERS); | FR1350846 [ ] (ALSACIENNE ATOM); | [A]GB965014 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]US3471194 (MARTIN JEAN ANTOINE, et al); | [A]FR2137015 (ALSACIENNE ATOM) |