EP0034984 - Method, apparatus and process for generating television signals for viewing and reproduction of three dimensional holografic visual scenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1983 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.1983 [1983/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomas, Walter Carl P.O. Box 1917 Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | For all designated states Thomas, Wayne William P.O. Box 1917 Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | For all designated states Thomas, Walter Carl P.O. Box 1917 Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | ||
For all designated states Thomas, Wayne William P.O. Box 1917 Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/35] | Representative(s) | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir., et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 81400256.4 | 19.02.1981 | [1981/35] | Priority number, date | EP19800400243 | 20.02.1980 Original published format: EP 80400243 | [1981/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0034984 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0034984 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/60 | [1981/35] | CPC: |
H04N13/334 (EP);
H04N13/214 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Erzeugen und Verarbeiten von dreidimensionalen Fernsehsignalen und beweglichen Hologrammen | [1981/35] | English: | Method, apparatus and process for generating television signals for viewing and reproduction of three dimensional holografic visual scenes | [1981/35] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour engendrer et traiter des signaux de télévision tridimensionnels et des hologrammes en mouvement | [1981/35] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 01.11.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/15] | 12.01.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.03.1981 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   23.04.1981 | 19.03.1981 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   23.04.1981 | 19.03.1981 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   23.04.1981 | 19.03.1981 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   23.04.1981 | 19.03.1981 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   23.04.1981 | 19.03.1981 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   23.04.1981 | 19.03.1981 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   23.04.1981 | 19.03.1981 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   23.04.1981 | 19.03.1981 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   23.04.1981 | 19.03.1981 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   23.04.1981 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.08.1982 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2285037 [ ]; | FR2400300 [ ] |