EP0035928 - Disc brake assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BENDIX CORPORATION Executive Offices Bendix Center Southfield Michigan 48037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/37] | For all designated states THE BENDIX CORPORATION Executive Offices Bendix Center Southfield Michigan 48037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ritsema, Irving R. 24222 US 20 South Bend Indiana 46628 / US | [1981/37] | Representative(s) | Brullé, Jean, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/37] | Brullé, Jean, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400306.7 | 27.02.1981 | [1981/37] | Priority number, date | US19800127708 | 06.03.1980 Original published format: US 127708 | [1981/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0035928 | Date: | 16.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0035928 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/224 | [1981/37] | CPC: |
F16D55/227 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0008 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0016 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0041 (EP,US);
F16D2200/0026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/37] | Title | German: | Scheibenbremsenanordnung | [1981/37] | English: | Disc brake assembly | [1981/37] | French: | Frein à disque | [1981/37] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/37] | 20.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.02.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1988/13] | GB | 27.02.1985 | |
SE | 28.02.1985 | ||
Former [1986/20] | GB | 27.02.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | FR1180633 [ ] (BENDIX SA); | FR1227386 [ ]; | FR1270684 [ ] (DBA SA); | FR76745E [ ] (DBA SA); | FR78983E [ ]; | DE1270341 [ ] (BERGISCHE STAHLINDUSTRIE); | US3480116 [ ] (RATH HEINRICH BERNHARD); | DE1914100 [ ] (MUELLER HERMANN E FA); | US3651898 [ ] (HABGOOD GORDON A); | DE2163586 [ ] (GIRLING LTD); | FR2257819 [ ] (DBA [FR]); | FR2346606 [ ] (GIRLING LTD [GB]) |