EP0037766 - Convergence analysis process of cathode ray tubes having three in-line guns and measuring device implenting this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1985 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1985 [1985/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIDEOCOLOR 7, boulevard Romain-Rolland 92128 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | For all designated states VIDEOCOLOR 7, boulevard Romain-Rolland F-92128 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pons, Claude Via U Pavoni, no 29 Grotta Ferrata (Roma) / IT | [1981/41] | Representative(s) | Boireau, Jacques Thomson-CSF SCPI 173, boulevard Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1982/29] |
Former [1981/41] | Lerner, François 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400471.9 | 25.03.1981 | [1981/41] | Priority number, date | FR19800007412 | 02.04.1980 Original published format: FR 8007412 | [1981/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037766 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037766 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/13, H01J9/42 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
H04N17/04 (EP,US);
H01J9/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1981/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Konvergenzanalyse einer Kathodenstrahlröhre, versehen mit drei in Reihe angeordneten Elektronenkanonen und Messwertgeber-Vorrichtung zur Anwendung des Verfahrens | [1984/24] | English: | Convergence analysis process of cathode ray tubes having three in-line guns and measuring device implenting this process | [1981/41] | French: | Procédé d'analyse de la convergence d'un tube cathodique à trois canons en ligne et dispositif formant capteur permettant la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1981/41] |
Former [1981/41] | Verfahren zur Konvergenzanalyse einer Kathodenstrahlröhre, versehen mit drei in Reihe angeordneten Elektrokanonen und Messwertgeber-Vorrichtung zur Anwendung des Verfahrens | Examination procedure | 26.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 17.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1220900 (MULLARD LTD [GB]); | [A]US4001877 (SIMPSON THEODORE FREDERICK); | [A]US4193086 (KAWAGUCHI IKUO [JP]); | [AP]DE2842818 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [P]EP0020934 (IBM [US]) |