blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0064110

EP0064110 - Light scattering photometer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.1987
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.01.1988 [1988/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A.M.T.E.C. Société dite
31, rue de Paris
F-06000 Nice / FR
[1982/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Woodley, William Alfred
Les Sylphides "C" Place Fontaine du Temple
06100 Nice / FR
[1982/45]
Representative(s)Hautier, Jean-Louis
Cabinet Hautier Office Méditerranéen de Brevets d'Invention 20, rue de la Liberté
06000 Nice / FR
[N/P]
Former [1983/29]Hautier, Jean-Louis
Cabinet Hautier 24 rue Masséna
F-06000 Nice / FR
Former [1982/45]Boireau, Jacques
SOCIETE INTERNATIONALE 19 rue de la Paix
F-75002 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date81400682.130.04.1981
[1982/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0064110
Date:10.11.1982
Language:FR
[1982/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0064110
Date:28.01.1987
Language:FR
[1987/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.1982
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/51
[1982/45]
CPC:
G01N21/51 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1982/45]
TitleGerman:Streuungsphotometer[1982/45]
English:Light scattering photometer[1982/45]
French:Appareil de photométrie par diffusion[1982/45]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure06.05.1983Examination requested  [1983/29]
10.09.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
11.07.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.10.1986Fee for grant paid
Opposition(s)29.10.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1988/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.1986Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.05.198303   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.1983
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4140902  ;
 [A]FR2415801  ;
 [A]US3795450  ;
 [A]US3886364
 [X]  - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 17, no. 7, 1er Avril 1978, New York (US) R. SPINRAD et al.: "Volume Scattering Function of Suspended Particulate Matter at Near Forward Angles: a Comparison of Experimental and Theoretical Values", pages 1125-1130
    [ ] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 16, no. 9, Septembre 1977, P. ELTERMAN: "Brewster Angle Light Trap", page 2352
 [A]  - ADVANCES IN INSTRUMENTATION, vol. 35, part. 1, 1980, Research Triangle Park, NC (US) H. FROCK et al.: "Scattered Light Measurements using a Photodiode Array", pages 549-555
 [A]  - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 19, no. 8, 15 Avril 1980, NEW YORK, (US) B. EWAN: "Fraunhofer Plane Analysis of Particle Field Holograms", pages 1368-1372
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.