Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0044228 | 13.02.1985 | B1 | EP0044228 | 17.02.1982 | A3 | EP0044228 | 20.01.1982 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU543032B | 28.03.1985 | B2 | AU7052081 | 19.11.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1183132 | 26.02.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3168868D1 | 28.03.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK189581 | 15.11.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8206556 | 16.08.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI811470L | 15.11.1981 | L | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2482603 | 30.04.1982 | B1 | FR2482603 | 20.11.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR73918 | 22.05.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE51348 | 10.12.1986 | B1 | IE811073L | 14.11.1981 | L | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL62850 | 29.06.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN153355 | 07.07.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5952163B | 18.12.1984 | B2 | JPS578201 | 16.01.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR840000724B | 24.05.1984 | B1 | KR830006332 | 24.09.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA19144 | 31.12.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO811631L | 16.11.1981 | L | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ197021 | 06.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT72995 | 01.07.1982 | B | PT72995 | 01.06.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4440926 | 03.04.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA813175 | 26.05.1982 | B | Priority number | Date | FR8010792 | 14.05.1980 |