EP0041426 - Coupled product between a lectin and a specific ligand, obtention and use in the biological field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1986 [1986/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/49] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux F-75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Avrameas, Stratis 92 Elysées 2 F-78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | 02 /
Guesdon, Jean-Luc 12, rue du Hameau F-75015 Paris / FR | [1981/49] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/49] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400777.9 | 18.05.1981 | [1981/49] | Priority number, date | FR19800011470 | 22.05.1980 Original published format: FR 8011470 | CH19800005428 | 15.07.1980 Original published format: CH 542880 | [1981/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0041426 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0041426 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/58 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
G01N33/531 (EP,US);
G01N33/532 (EP,US);
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
G01N33/586 (EP,US);
Y10S436/80 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1981/49] | G01N33/54, G01N33/58 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/49] | Title | German: | Kupplungsprodukt zwischen einem Lectin und einem spezifischen Liganden, Herstellung und Anwendung auf biologischem Gebiet | [1985/46] | English: | Coupled product between a lectin and a specific ligand, obtention and use in the biological field | [1981/49] | French: | Produit de couplage entre une lectine et un ligand spécifique, obtention et application dans le domaine biologique | [1981/49] |
Former [1981/49] | Kupplungsprodukt zwischen eines Lectin und einem spezifischen Ligand, Herstellung und Anwendung auf biologischem Gebiet | Examination procedure | 06.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 18.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1516640 (ORGANON NV); | [D]FR2334107 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]); | DE2732554 [ ] (ORION YHTYMAE OY); | [A]FR2418463 (NAL TRANSFUSION SANGUINE CENTR [FR], et al); | [E]DE2951678 (E Y LAB INC); | [XE]DE2952373 (E Y LAB INC); | [ED]WO8002296 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) | [D] - Immunochemistry, Vol. 6, 1969, Pergamon Press (GB) S. AVRAMEAS: "Coupling of Enzymes to Proteins with Glutaraldehyde", pages 43-52 * pages 43, 45-48 * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 81, No. 11, 16 Septembre 1974, Abrege 61897s, page 335, Columbus, Ohio (US) S. LEMIEUX et al.: "Local Hemolysis Plaque Assau using a new Method of Coupling Antigens on Sheep Erythrocytes by Glutaraldehyde" & Immunochemistry, 1974, 11(5), 261-9 | Examination | EP0033437 |