EP0042347 - Frame for child's seat or carrycot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/51] | Support for an infant | ||
[1985/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1986 [1986/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BABY RELAX Société anonyme dite: Centre Courbois F-64600 Anglet / FR | [1981/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillaume, Raymond 1633 Chemin des Cabrières F-06250 Mougins / FR | [1981/51] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 55, rue d'Amsterdam 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/51] | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al CABINET BEAU DE LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400971.8 | 17.06.1981 | [1981/51] | Priority number, date | FR19800013481 | 18.06.1980 Original published format: FR 8013481 | [1981/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0042347 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0042347 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042347 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A47D11/00 | [1981/51] | CPC: |
A47D1/002 (EP,US);
A47D11/00 (EP,US);
A47D11/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/51] | Title | German: | Rahmen, der in einen Kinderstuhl oder in ein Kinderbett umwandelbar ist | [1985/02] | English: | Frame for child's seat or carrycot | [1985/02] | French: | Support transformable en siège ou nacelle pour enfant | [1985/02] |
Former [1981/51] | Vorrichtung zum Stützen von Kindern | ||
Former [1981/51] | Support for an infant | ||
Former [1981/51] | Support pour enfant | Examination procedure | 07.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/38] | 02.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB258398 [ ] (FREDERICK HAGGER HEADLEY) |