EP0042795 - Hot water installation comprising a thermodynamic circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.1987 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National, 2, rue Louis Murat 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National 2, rue Louis Murat F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chapelle, Jules Antoine 4, Chemin du Merisier Noir F-91400 Orsay / FR | 02 /
Levacher, Jean-Pierre 1 à 5, Avenue Jean-Jaurès F-93123 La Courneuve / FR | 03 /
Sanzey, Emile 1 à 5, Avenue Jean-Jaurès F-93123 La Courneuve / FR | 04 /
Vironneau, Pierre 44, Chemin de la Flambère F-31300 Toulouse / FR | [1981/52] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81400986.6 | 19.06.1981 | [1981/52] | Priority number, date | FR19800013831 | 20.06.1980 Original published format: FR 8013831 | [1981/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042795 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042795 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F24D11/02 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
F24D11/0221 (EP,US);
F24D3/08 (EP,US);
F25B30/06 (EP,US);
F25B40/04 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US);
F25B5/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/52] | Title | German: | Heizwasserinstallation mit einem thermodynamischen Kreislauf | [1981/52] | English: | Hot water installation comprising a thermodynamic circuit | [1981/52] | French: | Installation de fourniture d'eau chaude comprenant un circuit thermodynamique | [1981/52] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/11] | 26.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 02.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2439954 [ ] (CHAPELLE JACQUES); | FR2439371 [ ] (AIRGEL); | US2876630 [ ] (CECIL BOLING); | DE1501180 [ ] (FRANKL LASZLO); | EP0004552 [ ] (SULZER AG [CH]); | DE2649872 [ ] (ORTNER HARALD) | Examination | US4141222 | US4142379 | GB652215 |