EP0045252 - Document reading or reproducing device, in particular for a telecopying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA 4 rue de Presbourg 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/05] | For all designated states MATRA 4 rue de Presbourg F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robbe, Michel 36bis, rue du Maréchal Maunoury 78700 Conflans / FR | 02 /
Hascoet, Joseph 68, rue Sainte Gemme 78860 Saint-Nom-La-Breteche / FR | 03 /
Lemoine, Maurice 131, avenue de la Clairière 78120 Rambouillet / FR | [1982/05] | Representative(s) | Michardière, Bernard Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/05] | Michardière, Bernard Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81401180.5 | 23.07.1981 | [1982/05] | Priority number, date | FR19800016369 | 24.07.1980 Original published format: FR 8016369 | [1982/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0045252 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0045252 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/18, H04N1/40 | [1982/05] | CPC: |
H04N1/02865 (EP);
H04N1/12 (EP);
H04N1/401 (EP);
H04N2201/0426 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1982/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Lesen oder Wiedergeben eines Dokumentes, insbesondere für einen Telekopieapparat | [1982/05] | English: | Document reading or reproducing device, in particular for a telecopying apparatus | [1982/05] | French: | Dispositif de lecture ou de restitution d'un document, en particulier pour appareil de télécopie | [1982/05] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/17] | 22.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/34] | 25.05.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2228337 [ ]; | FR2385112 [ ]; | FR2410924 [ ]; | DE2029537 [ ]; | FR2131391 [ ]; | US3962681 [ ]; | FR2070713 [ ]; | DE1016297 [ ]; | US3697683 [ ]; | FR2210829 [ ]; | US3800079 [ ] | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 15, no. 4, september 1972, New York, UST.E. CASSADA et al. "Facsimile scanner" pages 1401-1402 | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 20, no. 3, août 1977, New YorkUS D.R.MASON "Multifunction optical head" pages 1060-1061 | [ ] - TECHNIQUE, vol. 11, no. 3, juillet 1957 Muirhead & co. GB, M.S. PEMBROKE "An improved optical scanning head for facsimile transmitters"pages 23-24 |