EP0048662 - Coupler for removable electronic carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE INTERNATIONALE POUR L'INFORMATIQUE CII - HONEYWELL BULL (dite CII-HB) 94, avenue Gambetta 75020 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE INTERNATIONALE POUR L'INFORMATIQUE CII - HONEYWELL BULL (dite CII-HB) 94, avenue Gambetta F-75020 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ugon, Michel 94, avenue Gambetta F-75020 Paris / FR | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Doireau, Marc Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA, Poste Courrier: LV59C18, 68 route de Versaillles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | Doireau, Marc Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA, Poste Courrier: LV59C18, 68 route de Versaillles F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 81401431.2 | 14.09.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | FR19800019953 | 16.09.1980 Original published format: FR 8019953 | [1982/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048662 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/04 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
G06F13/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL, SE [1982/13] | Title | German: | Kopplung für abnehmbare elektronische Träger | [1982/13] | English: | Coupler for removable electronic carriers | [1982/13] | French: | Coupleur de supports électroniques amovibles | [1982/13] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 19.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/30] | 08.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/41] | 15.04.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2280143 [ ]; | GB1428704 [ ]; | FR2397027 [ ] | [ ] - MICROPROCESSORS, vol. 2, no. 1, Février 1978, Londres, (GB) SMITH: "Microprocessor system design"pages 3-10 | [ ] - EDN, vol. 24, no. 5, Mars 1979, Denver, (US) LEVASSEUR: "Simplify IEEE-488 implementation with a multifunction interface"pages 105-113 | [ ] - NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE FACHBERICHTE, vol. 37, 1969, VDE Verlag GmbH, Berlin, (DE) "Daten}bertragung. Vortr{ge der Factagung Daten}bertragung in Mannheim vom 19 bis 21 M{rz 1969", FICK: "Probleme der Prozedur und der Sicherheit bei der Daten}bertragung in Fernsprech-und Telegraphennetzen"pages 431-440 |