EP0052558 - Aromatic bromopolyfluoroalkyl ethers, and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1985 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1985 [1985/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC SPECIALITES CHIMIQUES "Les Miroirs" 18, Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/37] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC SPECIALITES CHIMIQUES "Les Miroirs" 18, Avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC INDUSTRIES 22, Avenue Montaigne F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rico, Isabelle Villa Laurencia 19, rue de la Butte aux Cailles F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
Wakselman, Claude 18, rue du Clos d'Alençon F-91120 Villebon/sur/Yvette / FR | [1982/21] | Representative(s) | Cazes, Jean-Marie Pierre, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | Cazes, Jean-Marie, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 81401771.1 | 06.11.1981 | [1982/21] | Priority number, date | FR19800024116 | 13.11.1980 Original published format: FR 8024116 | FR19810010319 | 25.05.1981 Original published format: FR 8110319 | [1982/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052558 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052558 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/225, C07C43/29, C07C79/35, C07C121/75, C07C103/26, C07C103/30, C07C93/26, C07C41/16 | [1982/21] | CPC: |
C07C205/37 (EP);
C07C41/16 (EP);
C07C43/225 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/16, C07C43/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/21] | Title | German: | Aromatische Brompolyfluoralkyläther und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1982/21] | English: | Aromatic bromopolyfluoroalkyl ethers, and process for their preparation | [1982/21] | French: | Nouveaux bromopolyfluoroalkyl éthers aromatiques et leur procédé de préparation | [1982/21] | Examination procedure | 03.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 19.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 17, 28 Octobre 1974, page 474, ref. 104876d, Columbus, Ohio, US, V.E. PLATONOV et al.: "Copyrolysis of pentafluorophenol with tetrafluoro-ethylene and bromine" & & Izv. Akad. Nauk. SSSR, Ser. Khim. 1974, (7), 1668-9 | [Y] - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 44, no. 16, 3 août 1979, American Chemical Society, A.E. FEIRING: "Chemistry in Hydrogen Fluoride. 7. A Novel Synthesis of Aryl Trifluoromethyl Ethers", pages 2907-2910 | [XP] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 22, no. 4, 1981, Pergamon Press Ltd., GB, I. RICO et al: "Synthèse de Composés Aromatiques comportant les Groupements OCF2Br et SCF2BR. I. Action du dibromodifluoromethane sur les thiophénate et phénate de potassium", pages 323-326 | Examination | - TETREAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 22, no. 4, 1981, pages 323-326 Pergamon Press Ltd., GB I. RICO et al.: "Synthèse de Composés Aromatiques comportant les Groupements OCF2Br et SCF2Br" I - Action du dibromodifluoro-méthyne sur les thiophénate et phénate de potassium |