EP0052567 - Method and apparatus for removing the packing means of a packing-box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1985 [1985/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEREG S.A. 12, place des Etats-Unis F-92120 Montrouge / FR | For all designated states BERTIN & CIE Boîte Postale No. 3 F-78370 Plaisir / FR | [1982/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marsac, Jean-Yves 104, Cours Albert Thomas F-69008 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Balzano, Lucien 27, Square Charles Baudelaire F-78760 Jouars Pontchartrain / FR | 03 /
Leprêtre, Marc 81, rue Paul Déroulède F-92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [1984/26] |
Former [1982/21] | 01 /
Marsac, Jean-Yves 104, Cours Albert Thomas F-69008 Lyon / FR | ||
02 /
Balzano, Lucien 27, Square Charles Baudelaire F-78760 Jouars Pontchartrain / FR | |||
03 /
Lepretre, Marc 81, rue Paul Déroulède F-92270 Bois Colombes / FR | Representative(s) | Dronne, Guy Giers Schlumberger 12 Place des Etats-Unis B.P. 121 92124 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/34] | Dronne, Guy Giers Schlumberger 12 Place des Etats-Unis B.P. 121 F-92124 Montrouge / FR | ||
Former [1982/21] | Colombe, Michel GIERS SCHLUMBERGER 12, place des Etats-Unis BP 121 F-92124 Montrouge Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 81401801.6 | 17.11.1981 | [1982/21] | Priority number, date | FR19800024503 | 19.11.1980 Original published format: FR 8024503 | [1982/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052567 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052567 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/00, B23P19/08 | [1982/21] | CPC: |
B25B27/0028 (EP,US);
B23P19/025 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49821 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2066 (EP,US);
Y10T83/364 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1982/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen des Dichtungsmaterials einer Dichtungsbüchse | [1982/21] | English: | Method and apparatus for removing the packing means of a packing-box | [1982/21] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'extraction des garnitures d'un presse-étoupe | [1982/21] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/37] | 22.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3861248 (BUSHINSKY GEORGE B); | [A]US3876213 (MILICZKY EUGENE W, et al); | [A]US3694894 (JELINEK JERRY G, et al) |