EP0054481 - Method of producing cutting edges, and inserts or other cutting materials having these cutting edges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FELDMUHLE PRODUITS TECHNIQUES FRANCE 53 Rue Charles Frérot F-94250 Gentilly / FR | [1982/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Habert, Guy 86 Rue Charles de Gaulle Bondoufle F-91000 Evry / FR | [1982/25] | Representative(s) | Rinuy, Guy, et al 14, Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | [1982/25] | Application number, filing date | 81401964.2 | 09.12.1981 | [1982/25] | Priority number, date | FR19800026426 | 12.12.1980 Original published format: FR 8026426 | [1982/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054481 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14 | [1982/25] | CPC: |
B23B27/145 (EP);
B23B2200/201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Gewinnen von Schneidkanten und Schneidplatten oder andere Schneidwerkstoffe, die diese Schneidkanten aufweisen | [1982/25] | English: | Method of producing cutting edges, and inserts or other cutting materials having these cutting edges | [1982/25] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'arêtes de coupe et plaquettes ou autres matériaux de coupe montrant ces nouvelles arêtes | [1982/25] | File destroyed: | 02.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 15.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 21.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/20] | 13.12.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1985 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3229349 [ ]; | DE2820810 [ ]; | DE2307229 [ ]; | DE2610097 [ ]; | FR2428491 [ ]; | FR2323474 [ ] | [ ] - Machinery, Volume 103, 7 Aout 1963, Machinery Publishing Co. Londres (GB) L. HISING "Development in Uddex Throw-Away Tip Cutters"page 303 *page 303; figure 2* |