EP0054485 - Device for cutting forage blocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. AUDUREAU Société dite: La Copechagniere F-85260 L'Herbergement (Vendée) / FR | [1982/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Audureau, Bernard Route de Nantes F-85620 Rocheserviere (Vendée) / FR | [1982/25] | Representative(s) | Ducas, Michel, et al Cabinet Boettcher 23, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/25] | Ducas, Michel Louis Marie, et al Cabinet Boettcher 23, rue La Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81401974.1 | 10.12.1981 | [1982/25] | Priority number, date | FR19800026302 | 11.12.1980 Original published format: FR 8026302 | [1982/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054485 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0054485 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A01F25/20 | [1982/25] | CPC: |
A01F25/2036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausschneiden eines Gärfutterblockes | [1982/25] | English: | Device for cutting forage blocks | [1982/25] | French: | Dispositif pour le découpage de blocs de fourrage | [1982/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/25] | 28.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 08.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.11.1984 | LU | 31.12.1984 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | IT | 07.11.1984 | |
LU | 31.12.1984 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 07.11.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | GB1518595 [ ] (BSL LANDMASCHF LAER, et al) | Examination | EP0041445 |