EP0037354 - Process for the production of acetic acid by carbonylation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/40] | Process for the production of carboxylic acids by carbonylation | ||
[1983/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.1984 [1984/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE DE BASE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/37] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE DE BASE 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1981/40] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC INDUSTRIES 22 Avenue Montaigne F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauthier-Lafaye, Jean 21, rue Duguesclin F-69006 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Perron, Robert La Pecolière F-69390 Charly / FR | [1981/40] | Representative(s) | Varnière-Grange, Monique, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches de Saint-Fons B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | [1982/37] |
Former [1981/40] | Varniere-Grange, Monique RHONE-POULENC RECHERCHES Centre de Recherches de Saint-Fons Service Brevets B.P. 62 F-69190 Saint-Fons / FR | Application number, filing date | 81420048.1 | 30.03.1981 | [1981/40] | Priority number, date | FR19800007876 | 02.04.1980 Original published format: FR 8007876 | [1981/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037354 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037354 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/12, C07C53/08 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
C07C51/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/12, C07C53/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Essigsäure durch Carbonylierung | [1983/20] | English: | Process for the production of acetic acid by carbonylation | [1983/20] | French: | Procédé de préparation de l'acide acétique par carbonylation | [1983/20] |
Former [1981/40] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Carbonsäuren durch Carbonylierung | ||
Former [1981/40] | Process for the production of carboxylic acids by carbonylation | ||
Former [1981/40] | Procédé de préparation d'acides carboxyliques par carbonylation | Examination procedure | 01.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 05.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | BE366710 [ ]; | FR1045404 [ ] (BASF AG) |