EP0047709 - Rows-and-stitches calculator for knitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1985 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jacquemet, Jean-Claude F-01430 Maillat / FR | [1982/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/11] | Representative(s) | Karmin, Roger, et al Cabinet MONNIER, 142-150, Cours Lafayette, B.P. 3058 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [1982/11] | Application number, filing date | 81420133.1 | 01.09.1981 | [1982/11] | Priority number, date | FR19800019594 | 05.09.1980 Original published format: FR 8019594 | [1982/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047709 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047709 | Date: | 29.02.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G06G1/00, G06G1/08 | [1982/11] | CPC: |
G06G1/0005 (EP);
G06G1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/11] | Title | German: | Reihen- und Maschenrechner für die Strickerei | [1982/11] | English: | Rows-and-stitches calculator for knitting | [1982/11] | French: | Calculateur de rangs et de mailles pour le tricotage | [1982/11] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/25] | 14.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1984 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH187995 (SPICHTIN ADELE [CH], et al); | [A]FR947923 ; | [A]FR2192339 (RIEHLE HARALD [DE]) |