EP0036380 - Detachable attachment for a skiboot and apparatus for securing the same to a ski [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1983 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.1984 [1984/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sebbak, Christian Les Saules Quartier Rigoulon Rte de Saint Canadet 13100 Aix en Provence / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | For all designated states Sebbak, Christian Les Saules Quartier Rigoulon Rte de Saint Canadet F-13100 Aix en Provence / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/38] | Representative(s) | Marek, Pierre Cabinet Marek 28, rue de la Loge 13235 Marseille Cédex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | Marek, Pierre 32, rue de la Loge F-13002 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 81430005.9 | 10.03.1981 | [1981/38] | Priority number, date | FR19800005471 | 10.03.1980 Original published format: FR 8005471 | [1981/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036380 | Date: | 23.09.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04, A43C15/00 | [1981/38] | CPC: |
A43B5/0419 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/38] | Title | German: | Abnehmbarer Untersatz für Skischuhe und Vorrichtung zu seiner Befestigung auf einem Ski | [1981/38] | English: | Detachable attachment for a skiboot and apparatus for securing the same to a ski | [1981/38] | French: | Patin amovible pour chaussure de ski et dispositif d'arimage d'un tel patin sur un ski | [1981/38] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 13.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/11] | 10.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/02] | 05.10.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH580927 ; | CH595791 [ ]; | DE2822366 [ ]; | DE2520183 [ ]; | US3665620 [ ]; | [A]FR2290171 ; | [A]DE2746052 |