Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.1985 [1985/03] |
26.09.1984 | Change - representative | published on 28.11.1984 [1984/48] |
19.11.1983 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.01.1984 [1984/03] |
30.06.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.09.1982 [1982/35] |
24.03.1982 | Change - applicant | published on 26.05.1982 [1982/21] |
20.11.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.01.1982 [1982/03] |