EP0045711 - Blinds with vertical strips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXAA Société Anonyme de droit français 140 Avenue du Maréchal Leclerc F-33130 Begles / FR | [1985/07] |
Former [1982/06] | For all designated states SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE MARQUES ET BREVETS SOCIETE ANONYME FRANçAISE DITE: 2 rue de Rivière F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demptos, Bernard 140, avenue du Maréchal Leclerc F-33130 Begles / FR | [1982/06] | Representative(s) | Thébault, Jean-Louis SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/06] | Thébault, Jean-Louis Cabinet Thébault S.A. 1 Allées de Chartres F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 81450009.6 | 31.07.1981 | [1982/06] | Priority number, date | FR19800017241 | 01.08.1980 Original published format: FR 8017241 | [1982/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045711 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045711 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/36 | [1982/06] | CPC: |
E06B9/386 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/06] | Title | German: | Markisen mit senkrechten Streifen | [1982/06] | English: | Blinds with vertical strips | [1982/06] | French: | Perfectionnements aux stores à bandes verticales | [1982/06] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/49] | 06.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2240344 [ ]; | FR2349025 [ ]; | CA1082095 [ ]; | GB1271426 [ ]; | FR60623E [ ] |