EP0051040 - Apparatus and method for the grinding of material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.10.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REXNORD INC. P.O. Box 2022 Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53201 / US | [1982/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karra, Vijia K. 5566 Oakwood Court Greendale Wisconsin 53129 / US | [1982/18] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1982/18] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 81630066.9 | 23.10.1981 | [1982/18] | Priority number, date | US19800200727 | 27.10.1980 Original published format: US 200727 | [1982/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0051040 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0051040 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B02C17/04 | [1982/18] | CPC: |
B02C19/005 (EP,US);
B02C17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/18] | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zur Zerkleinerung von Material | [1982/18] | English: | Apparatus and method for the grinding of material | [1982/18] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour le broyage de matériaux | [1982/18] | File destroyed: | 14.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/38] | 08.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/51] | 11.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Additional claims {1} | 21.06.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1791100 (LYKKEN HENRY G); | [Y]US2018232 (SILVER DRAYTON A); | [A]US2456266 (WEARING GATES D); | [Y]DE1061597 (STADT DUESSELDORF STADTWERKE V); | [A]DE2100364 |