EP0069818 - Device for the intermittent interruption of the needle motion on embroidery or sewing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.1986 [1986/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZSK Stickmaschinen GmbH Magdeburger Strasse 38-40 47800 Krefeld-Gartenstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | For all designated states ZSK Stickmaschinen Gesellschaft mbH Elbestrasse 31 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [1983/03] | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Carl Zangs AG Oberdiessemer Strasse 15 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slomma, Heinz-Georg Konenpfad 5 D-4060 Viersen 11 / DE | [1983/03] | Representative(s) | Stark, Walter Moerser Strasse 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/36] | Stark, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Moerser Strasse 140 D-47803 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [1984/38] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1983/03] | Stenger, Alex, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A. Stenger Dipl.-Ing. W. Watzke Dipl.-Ing. H.J. Ring Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-4000 Düsseldorf 11 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81710023.3 | 15.07.1981 | [1983/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0069818 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069818 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | D05B55/16 | [1983/03] | CPC: |
D05B81/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum zeitweisen Unterbrechen der Sticknadelbewegung an Stick- oder Nähmaschinen | [1983/03] | English: | Device for the intermittent interruption of the needle motion on embroidery or sewing machines | [1983/03] | French: | Dispositif pour suspendre momentanément le mouvement de l'aiguille sur machines à broder ou à coudre | [1983/03] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1982 | Examination requested [1983/03] | 14.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2008632 [ ] |