EP0055207 - Method of making bag blocks, and bag strip produced thereby as an intermediate product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.1985 [1985/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scherz, Wilhelm Bergwerkstrasse 5 D-7180 Crailsheim / DE | [1982/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Eibenweg 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 70 / DE | [1982/26] | Application number, filing date | 81710058.9 | 22.12.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | DE19803049145 | 24.12.1980 Original published format: DE 3049145 | [1982/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0055207 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0055207 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B31B23/00 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
B31B70/00 (EP);
B31B70/988 (EP,US);
B31B2150/002 (EP);
B31B2155/00 (EP);
B31B2155/002 (EP);
B31B2160/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Tütenblöcken und hierbei als Zwischenprodukt erhaltene Tütenbahn | [1982/26] | English: | Method of making bag blocks, and bag strip produced thereby as an intermediate product | [1982/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de blocs de sacs et gaine réalisée comme produit intermédiaire | [1982/26] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 03.07.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/03] | 30.07.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1985/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2501691 (LEHMACHER HANS); | [APD]DE2931187 (SCHERZ WILHELM); | [A]FR1538693 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER); | [T]US4360355 (SUOMINEN HEIKKI S) |