EP0037368 - Radial gap magnetic rotary coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.08.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/40] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100 D-91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laenens, Werner Küsterstrasse 14 D-1000 Berlin 20 / DE | [1981/40] | Application number, filing date | 81730030.4 | 09.03.1981 | [1981/40] | Priority number, date | DE19803012740 | 28.03.1980 Original published format: DE 3012740 | [1981/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037368 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H02K49/10 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
H02K49/106 (EP,US);
H02K5/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, LI [1981/40] | Title | German: | Magnetische Zentral-Drehkupplung | [1981/40] | English: | Radial gap magnetic rotary coupling | [1981/40] | French: | Accouplement magnétique rotatif à entrefer radial | [1981/40] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 29.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1984/44] | 02.06.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1984/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1984 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2353165 [ ] (KLAUS UNION FRANZ [DE]) |