EP0048687 - Intervention case for a first aid doctor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlichting, Klaus, Dr. Länderallee 42 D-1000 Berlin 19 / DE | [1982/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Böning, Manfred, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | Böning, Manfred, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Dieter Jander Dr.-Ing. Manfred Böning Leistikowstrasse 2 D-14050 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 81730097.3 | 22.09.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | DE19803036154 | 23.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3036154 | [1982/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0048687 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0048687 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048687 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61F17/00, A45C11/24, A45C13/02, A45C9/00 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
A45C11/24 (EP);
A45C13/02 (EP);
A45C2011/007 (EP);
A45C3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/36] | A61F17/00, A45C13/02, A45C9/00, A45C9/00 | ||
Former IPC [1982/13] | A45C11/24, A45C13/02, A45C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1982/13] | Title | German: | Einsatzkoffer für Notärzte | [1982/13] | English: | Intervention case for a first aid doctor | [1982/13] | French: | Coffre d'intervention pour médecin de premier secours | [1982/13] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 08.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1644830 (ENNIS HENDERSON ALBERT); | [A]US2013281 (MCCALLA LAWRENCE H); | [A]US3285681 (KURT NIEDERER); | [A]CH485556 (SCHOELLER ALEXANDER [DE]); | [A]GB1454795 (ANDERSON K A); | [A]US4054342 (COOK AMY) |