Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
27.12.1982 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.1983 [1983/09] |
13.11.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.01.1982 [1982/02] |
13.11.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.01.1982 [1982/02] |