Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0043800 | Global Dossier | 13.01.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH519380 | 07.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG35323 | 15.03.1984 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CH519380 | 07.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1170854 | 17.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | CH519380 | 07.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CS226431 | 19.03.1984 | B2 | Priority number | Date | CH519380 | 07.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DD201637 | 03.08.1983 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH519380 | 07.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK299281 | 08.01.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | CH519380 | 07.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR74371 | 28.06.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | CH519380 | 07.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5746902 | 17.03.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | CH519380 | 07.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RO82548 | 26.09.1983 | A | RO82548 | 30.08.1983 | B | Priority number | Date | CH519380 | 07.07.1980 |