EP0043800 - Synergistic agents and method for the selective control of weeds, particularly in sugar beets and fodder beets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/02] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quadranti, Marco, Dr. Promenade 24 CH-5200 Brugg / CH | 02 /
Maag, Kurt Krebsenbachweg 18 CH-4148 Pfeffingen / CH | [1982/02] | Application number, filing date | 81810268.3 | 01.07.1981 | [1982/02] | Priority number, date | CH19800005193 | 07.07.1980 Original published format: CH 519380 | [1982/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043800 | Date: | 13.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/22, A01N43/64, // (A01N47/22, 43:40),(A01N43/64, 43:40) | [1982/02] | CPC: |
A01N43/707 (EP);
A01N47/22 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/707, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/22, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/22, A01N43/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/02] | Title | German: | Synergistisches Mittel und Verfahren zur selektiven Unkrautbekämpfung, insbesondere in Zucker- und Futterrübenkulturen | [1982/02] | English: | Synergistic agents and method for the selective control of weeds, particularly in sugar beets and fodder beets | [1982/02] | French: | Agents synergiques et procédé pour combattre sélectivement les mauvaises herbes, particulièrement dans les cultures de betteraves sucrières et fourragères | [1982/02] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 03.07.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 11.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.06.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0004414 [ ] |