blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0042825

EP0042825 - Combine harvester provided with an axial-flow separating unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.1986
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.1988Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 30.03.1988 [1988/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIETRO LAVERDA S.p.A.
Via Francesco Laverda 15/17
36042 Breganze (Vicenza) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1981/52]For all designated states
PIETRO LAVERDA S.p.A.
Via Francesco Laverda 15/17
I-36042 Breganze (Vicenza) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Raineri, Giuseppe
Via Bellini 20/22
I-36061 Bassano del Grappa (Vicenza) / IT
[1981/52]
Representative(s)Jacobacci, Filippo, et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1981/52]Jacobacci, Filippo, et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
I-10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date81830091.502.06.1981
[1981/52]
Priority number, dateIT19800053320U19.06.1980         Original published format: IT 5332080 U
[1981/52]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0042825
Date:30.12.1981
Language:EN
[1981/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0042825
Date:10.04.1985
Language:EN
[1985/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.1981
ClassificationIPC:A01F12/44
[1981/52]
CPC:
A01F12/442 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1981/52]
TitleGerman:Mähdrescher mit Trenneinrichtung der Axialflussbauart[1981/52]
English:Combine harvester provided with an axial-flow separating unit[1981/52]
French:Moissonneuse-batteuse comportant des organes de séparation à circulation axiale[1981/52]
Examination procedure15.06.1982Examination requested  [1982/33]
09.02.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.09.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.1984Fee for grant paid
05.11.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.01.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE10.04.1985
NL10.04.1985
SE30.04.1985
[1988/13]
Former [1988/04]BE10.04.1985
NL10.04.1985
Former [1986/28]NL10.04.1985
Documents cited:SearchDE3023961  [ ] (WITZEL H D);
 FR2460607  [ ] (WITZEL HOMER [US]);
 BE884213  [ ] (WITZEL H D);
 GB2057240  [ ] (VERSATILE CORNAT CORP);
 GB2053644  [ ] (WITZEL H D);
 US3613691  [ ] (WILSHUSEN ALBERT R);
 DE1901157  [ ] (FAHR AG MASCHF [DE]);
 US2927694  [ ] (SCRANTON CHARLES J, et al);
 DE1582650  [ ] (TEXAS INDUSTRIES INC);
 GB1543036  [ ] (CLAYSON NV);
 US4178942  [ ] (NUSSER JOSEF [DE]);
 US1604912  [ ] (BRUCE HATHAWAY JUNIUS);
 FR2238418  [ ] (MASSEY FERGUSON SA [FR]);
 US3126893  [ ];
 DE1297390  [ ] (INT HARVESTER CO);
 GB1049834  [ ] (MASSEY FERGUSON LTD);
 FR1223005  [ ] (INT HARVESTER CO)
ExaminationDE1482836
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.