EP0045286 - Electronic indicator of absorbed current, expressed as a percentage of a prefixed limit, the exceeding of which activates an acoustic alarm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1983 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.1983 [1983/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basini, Bruno via Colleferro 5 I-00189 Rome / IT | [1982/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/05] | Application number, filing date | 81830117.8 | 14.07.1981 | [1982/05] | Priority number, date | IT19800049367 | 29.07.1980 Original published format: IT 4936780 | [1982/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0045286 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0045286 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/14, // H02H3/04 | [1982/05] | CPC: |
H02H3/04 (EP);
H02J3/14 (EP);
H02H1/06 (EP);
H02J2310/60 (EP);
Y02B70/3225 (EP);
Y04S20/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1982/05] | Title | German: | Elektronischer Verbrauchsstromanzeiger, ausgeführt mit prozentualem, einstellbaren Grenzwert, dessen Überschreitung einen akustischen Alarm auslöst | [1982/05] | English: | Electronic indicator of absorbed current, expressed as a percentage of a prefixed limit, the exceeding of which activates an acoustic alarm | [1982/05] | French: | Indicateur électronique de courant absorbé, exprimé en tant que pourcentage d'une limite prédéterminée dont le dépassement met en action une alarme acoustique | [1982/05] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 05.11.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/15] | 15.01.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2923831 [ ] (WALLENE FRANK O); | FR1267270 [ ] (ELECTRONIQUE ET D AUTOMATIQUE, et al); | FR1361226 [ ]; | FR2147841 [ ] (MERLIN GERIN); | US4031406 [ ] (LEYDE WARREN L, et al); | FR2344161 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |