blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0064122

EP0064122 - Digital ITS signal generator usable as a reference standard instrument in systems for producing, transmitting and diffusing color television signals by PAL system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.1987
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.11.1987 [1987/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAI RADIOTELEVISIONE ITALIANA
Viale Mazzini 14
00195 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [1982/45]For all designated states
RAI RADIOTELEVISIONE ITALIANA
Viale Mazzini 14
I-00195 Rome / IT
Inventor(s)01 / D'Amato, Paolo
Via Monte Ortigara, 35
I-10100 Torino / IT
02 / Cerruti, Giovanni
Via Mancini, 12
I-10100 Torino / IT
[1982/45]
Representative(s)Zini, Alessandro
Ufficio Tecnico Internazionale Brevetti Ing. Alessandro Zini Piazza Castello 1
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1982/45]Zini, Alessandro
Ufficio Tecnico Internazionale Brevetti Ing. Alessandro Zini Piazza Castello 1
I-20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date81830150.926.08.1981
[1982/45]
Priority number, dateIT1981002146630.04.1981         Original published format: IT 2146681
[1982/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0064122
Date:10.11.1982
Language:EN
[1982/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0064122
Date:09.05.1984
Language:EN
[1984/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0064122
Date:26.11.1986
Language:EN
[1986/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.1984
ClassificationIPC:H04N17/02
[1986/48]
CPC:
H04N17/02 (EP)
Former IPC [1982/45]H04N9/62
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1982/45]
TitleGerman:Digitaler Prüfzeilensignalgenerator verwendbar als Referenzstandardgerät in Systemen zum Erzeugen, Übertragen und Senden von PAL-Farbfernsehsignalen[1982/45]
English:Digital ITS signal generator usable as a reference standard instrument in systems for producing, transmitting and diffusing color television signals by PAL system[1982/45]
French:Générateur numérique de signaux-tests d'insertion utilisable comme instrument de standard de référence dans les systèmes pour produire, transmettre et diffuser des signaux de télévision en couleur du système PAL[1982/45]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure03.11.1982Examination requested  [1983/08]
15.10.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
30.05.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.1986Fee for grant paid
30.07.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
18.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1455821  (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP);
 [A]US4215367  (MOORE JOHN E [GB], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.