EP0034574 - A method of preventing corrosion in boiler-plant equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1985 [1985/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fagersta AB Box 501 773 01 Fagersta / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/34] | For all designated states Fagersta AB Box 501 S-773 01 Fagersta / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernstein, Ragnar Lennart Herman Västmannavägen 6A S-773 00 Fagersta / SE | 02 /
Tiberg, Lars Axel Postläda 4201 S-770 20 Söderbärke / SE | [1981/34] | Representative(s) | Uusitalo, Isak Carminger, Uusitalo & Nyberg Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 7274 S-103 89 Stockholm / SE | [1981/34] | Application number, filing date | 81850015.9 | 30.01.1981 | [1981/34] | Priority number, date | SE19800001144 | 14.02.1980 Original published format: SE 8001144 | [1981/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0034574 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0034574 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034574 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C23F15/00, F22B37/02 | [1981/34] | CPC: |
C23F15/00 (EP,US);
F22B37/025 (EP,US);
F24H9/0036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Vermeiden von Korrosionen in der Ausrüstung einer Kesselanlage | [1981/34] | English: | A method of preventing corrosion in boiler-plant equipment | [1981/34] | French: | Procédé pour prévenir la corrosion dans l'équipement d'une installation de chaudière | [1981/34] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/22] | 13.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1288330 [ ] (ASS ELECT IND); | [A]DE2406467 (SCHNEIDER KG ASK A); | GB1438499 [ ] (BEAUMONT LTD F E); | US4141702 [ ] (DEVRIES EGBERT); | [P]DE2936684 (LAGERQUIST); | [P]GB2031572 (KIENZLE APPARATE GMBH, et al) |