EP0035482 - A method of adjustably fixing a frame or the like in an opening and a locking washer for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1985 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1985 [1985/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Rawlplug Company Limited Rawlplug House London Road Kingston-upon-Thames Surrey KT2 6NR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/31] | For all designated states The Rawlplug Company Limited Rawlplug House London Road Kingston-upon-Thames Surrey KT2 6NR / GB | ||
Former [1982/08] | For all designated states Burmah Industrial Products Limited 147 London Road Kingston-upon-Thames Surrey KT2 6NH / GB | ||
Former [1981/36] | For all designated states Svenska Rawlplug Co AB Box 17005 S-104 62 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bjurséll, Bertil Djupedalsgatan 18 S-557 00 Värgärda / SE | [1981/36] | Representative(s) | Burman, Tore, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/36] | Burman, Tore, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 81850032.4 | 27.02.1981 | [1981/36] | Priority number, date | SE19800001548 | 28.02.1980 Original published format: SE 8001548 | [1984/30] |
Former [1981/36] | deleted | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0035482 | Date: | 09.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0035482 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | E06B1/60, E06B1/02, E04B1/38 | [1981/36] | CPC: |
E06B1/60 (EP);
F16B17/00 (EP);
F16B39/02 (EP);
F16B39/106 (EP);
F16B41/002 (EP);
F16B5/0233 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1981/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum ausrichtbaren Befestigen eines Rahmens oder dgl. in einer Öffnung und Sicherungsscheibe zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1981/36] | English: | A method of adjustably fixing a frame or the like in an opening and a locking washer for carrying out the method | [1981/36] | French: | Procédé pour la fixation ajustable d'un châssis ou analogue dans une ouverture et rondelle de fixation pour réaliser ce procédé | [1981/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/19] | 27.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH482076 [ ] (VOULLAIRE HANSGOTTFRIED [DE]); | [A]DD104833 ; | [A]DE1962465 ; | [A]DE2500214 (BUSCH GUENTER) |