EP0038858 - DIGITALLY CONTROLLED AUTOMATIC BIAS CIRCUIT FOR MAGNETIC RECORDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1987 [1987/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMPEX CORPORATION 401 Broadway M.S. 3-35 Redwood City California 94063-3199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/44] | For all designated states AMPEX CORPORATION 401 Broadway M.S. 3-35 Redwood City California 94063-3199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIN, Lucas K. 4541 Renato Court Fremont CA 94560 / US | [1981/44] | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/44] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 81900034.0 | 31.10.1980 | [1981/44] | WO1980US01476 | Priority number, date | US19790090137 | 01.11.1979 Original published format: US 90137 | [1981/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8101342 | Date: | 14.05.1981 | [1981/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0038858 | Date: | 04.11.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038858 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/03 | [1986/41] | CPC: |
G11B5/03 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/44] | G11B5/47 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/44] | Title | German: | DIGITAL GESTEUERTE AUTOMATISCHE VORMAGNETISIERUNGSSCHALTUNG FÜR DIE MAGNETISCHE AUFZEICHNUNG | [1981/44] | English: | DIGITALLY CONTROLLED AUTOMATIC BIAS CIRCUIT FOR MAGNETIC RECORDING | [1981/44] | French: | CIRCUIT AUTOMATIQUE DE POLARISATION COMMANDE DE MANIERE DIGITALE POUR L'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE | [1981/44] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1981 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1981 | Search fee paid | 22.06.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1981 | Examination requested [1982/19] | 19.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4038692 (UMEDA KENKICHI, et al); | [A]US4011585 (SUNAGA YOSHIMITSU) |