Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1985 [1985/14] |
21.01.1984 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.03.1984 [1984/12] |
20.07.1983 | Change - representative | published on 21.09.1983 [1983/38] |
18.12.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.02.1982 [1982/07] |
18.12.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.02.1982 [1982/07] |