EP0045750 - DEVICE FOR CUTTING AND THREADING PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/07] | DEVICE FOR CUTTING AND TAPPING PIPES | ||
[1984/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1985 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1985 [1985/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEORG FISCHER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mühlentalstrasse 105 CH-8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [1982/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUCHNER, Xaver Neunkircherstrasse 8 D-7893 Jestetten / DE | [1982/07] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1983/38] |
Former [1982/07] | Lusuardi, Werther Giovanni, Dr., et al Dr. Lusuardi AG, Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 81900055.5 | 22.12.1980 | [1982/07] | WO1980CH00158 | Priority number, date | CH19800001166 | 13.02.1980 Original published format: CH 116680 | [1982/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8102267 | Date: | 20.08.1981 | [1981/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045750 | Date: | 17.02.1982 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045750 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/12] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B23D45/12, B23G1/52, B23P23/02 | [1982/07] | CPC: |
B23P23/02 (EP,US);
B23D45/126 (EP,US);
B23G1/22 (EP,US);
Y10T408/355 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/07] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM TRENNEN UND GEWINDESCHNEIDEN VON ROHREN | [1982/07] | English: | DEVICE FOR CUTTING AND THREADING PIPES | [1984/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE CISAILLEMENT ET LE TARAUDAGE DE TUYAUX | [1982/07] |
Former [1982/07] | DEVICE FOR CUTTING AND TAPPING PIPES | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1981 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1981 | Examination requested [1982/07] | 23.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB674650 (PRINCEP ENGINEERING COMPANY LT, et al); | US3332095 [ ] (IVESTER JOE A); | [A]DE2157787 (OGURA CHUCK SEISAKUSHO CO LTD); | [A]DE1777391 (FOELL REMSWERK); | [A]FR2279512 (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]); | [A]GB2025279 (EMERSON ELECTRIC CO) |